READ ACADEMY EDUCATION

Charity number: 1156203
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 February 2021 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 February 2021 116 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 June 2017 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 June 2017 233 days late Download