Trustees CARDIFF DEAF CENTRE

Charity number: 1156719
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAFYDD EVELEIGH Chair 01 September 2015
None on record
Miriam Frances Grimshaw Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Robert Brian Wilks Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
FIONA NICHOLSON Trustee 01 November 2015
None on record
EDWARD JENKINS Trustee 03 February 2014
CAMBRIAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR DEAF CHILDREN IN WALES
Received: On time
SARAH SMITH Trustee 03 February 2014
None on record
STUART PARKINSON Trustee 03 February 2014
None on record