HOWICK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1156634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £6.47k £6.72k £27.62k £13.87k £45.11k
Total expenditure £3.39k £4.46k £36.81k £13.51k £42.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.01k N/A £10.00k