Accounts and annual returns PHELIX RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1156666
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 575 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 575 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 May 2022 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 May 2022 204 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late Download Open in new window