LEA ROWING CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1157563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £826.32k £577.68k £397.34k £397.92k £349.37k
Total expenditure £357.80k £324.75k £321.92k £320.13k £325.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £488 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £30.13k N/A N/A £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £617.87k £338.83k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £25.33k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £208.36k £150.29k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £84 £63.23k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £357.80k £306.73k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £18.02k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £183.20k £1.39k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £1.94k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A