LEA ROWING CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1157563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David James Porter Trustee 07 October 2018 None on record
Simon Clark Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
Sara Cinamon Trustee 04 November 2017 None on record
Antoinette Jucker Chair 04 November 2017 None on record
Charles Robert Hayden Barry Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
Fred Shearer Trustee 12 October 2014
YOUTH EXPERIENCE IN SPORT Received: On time
DONALD RICHARD NIVISON ELLIS Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record
Jennie Brotherston Trustee 05 February 2019 None on record
Mark Cushway Trustee 05 February 2019 None on record
Matt Pooley Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record