Accounts and annual returns NICOLAUS COPERNICUS POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1158308
Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 05 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 10 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window