KRAFTWORKS

Charity number: 1157498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required