ST PAULS CHURCH WORCESTER

Charity number: 1159042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £94.80k £195.78k £201.22k £169.52k £150.57k
Total expenditure £103.47k £197.13k £192.49k £143.90k £124.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £4.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.51k