Trustees ST MARGARET'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1160900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Thompson Chair 01 April 2016
None on record
Anna Stephenson Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Dr Christopher Anthony Harold Ramsden Trustee 04 November 2019
None on record
Deborah Rowley-Conwy Trustee 09 July 2018
None on record
ELIZABETH MARY MCCABE Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
PAUL JEFFERSON Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
JOHN WOODS Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
David Welsh Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record
ANTHONY WALKER Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record