Financial history THE GOSPORT SHED

Charity number: 1159661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £21.62k £24.36k £36.93k £21.08k £10.27k
Total expenditure £6.52k £5.19k £44.59k £17.68k £3.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A