Accounts and annual returns WEST HARTLEPOOL SCHOLARSHIP FUND FOR GIRLS (ENGLISH MARTYRS SCHOOL)

Charity number: 505144
Charity reporting is overdue by 1260 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 165 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 530 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 530 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 895 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 895 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1260 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1260 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 June 2024 1602 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required