Accounts and annual returns QUBA TRUST

Charity number: 1159575
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 January 2021 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2021 14 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 January 2020 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2020 24 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 January 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 January 2018 18 February 2019 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2018 18 February 2019 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 January 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 December 2017 10 days late Download Open in new window