ST JOSEPH'S DERBY PTA

Charity number: 1159338
Charity reporting is overdue by 867 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Accounts and TAR 24 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Annual return 24 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 501 days
Accounts and TAR 24 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 501 days
Annual return 24 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 867 days
Accounts and TAR 24 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 867 days
Annual return 24 September 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 24 September 2016 20 November 2017 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 September 2016 Not Required