Financial history RAPID RELIEF TEAM

Charity number: 1161586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £606.87k £813.98k £1.30m £1.56m £1.63m
Total expenditure £313.03k £494.24k £971.05k £1.37m £1.23m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £400 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.27k N/A N/A £186.95k £25.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £594.58k £795.78k £1.15m £1.50m £1.42m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £16.62k £143.03k £60.26k £99.01k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £1.58k £0 £4.10k £112.78k
Income - Other £12.30k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £300 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £294.28k £473.29k £782.45k £1.21m £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.76k £20.95k £188.60k £160.89k £166.70k
Expenditure - Governance £34.61k £36.71k £18.36k £51.27k £32.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £3.02k £0 £12.68k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0