Trustees MERTHYR TYDFIL LEISURE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1160964
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew William Alyn Griffiths | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justin Mark Smith | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Ellen Jones | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Lewis | Trustee | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Charles Ashdown | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheridan Methuen | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louisa Kester | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ALED GRUFFYDD JONES | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.