Trustees MOSSLEY AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1160167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Meredith Hoyle | Chair | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Hope | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Rose | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melinda Patricia Green | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Firth | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Devlin | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Hughes | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Farrow | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wood | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Samuel John Maurice | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE DAVENPORT | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA FURNESS | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.