Accounts and annual returns EXTENDING GRACE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES LTD

Charity number: 1160866
Charity reporting is overdue by 257 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 257 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 257 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 30 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 01 February 2021 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 01 February 2021 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window