Trustees FRENCH SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AMELIE MALLET Chair 26 May 2017
None on record
Tatiana Pogossian Trustee 15 April 2024
APC | Association des Parents du CFBL
Received: On time
Ghislain Michel Marie Bouriez Trustee 13 March 2023
None on record
Isabelle Myriam Lamy Trustee 11 October 2021
None on record
Gael Anne Panhelleux-Le Douarec Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
DANIELLE RAYMOND Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record