Trustees NEWCIS

Charity number: 1159934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH JOY TAYLOR Chair 03 November 2014
CLWYD COUNTY GUIDES
Received: On time
Maureen Pamela Cameron Trustee 02 June 2022
None on record
Linda Claire Hunter Trustee 13 May 2022
None on record
Angharad Lois Brookes Trustee 13 May 2022
None on record
Philip Heard Trustee 15 May 2020
None on record
Glyn Jelley Trustee 08 May 2020
None on record
Sandra Wilson Trustee 15 February 2019
None on record
Rob Lewis Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Emily Littlehales Trustee 25 January 2017
None on record
GILL HARRISON Trustee 03 November 2014
WALKABOUT FLINTSHIRE
Received: On time