Accounts and annual returns SALVATION OF THE LIVING ROCK REVEALED
Charity number: 1161662
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 January 2023 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 January 2023 | 234 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2022 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2022 | 360 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 14 November 2019 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 29 September 2019 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 14 November 2019 | 167 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window