SEABROOKE RISE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1160237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.31k £29.77k £18.55k £24.12k £18.56k
Total expenditure £6.78k £11.58k £31.10k £11.46k £22.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A