Trustees THE VIRGIN MONEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mazin Alkirwi Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
Amanda Janet Jordan Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Edward Spencer Younger Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
KEITH MERRIN Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Hannah Elizabeth Underwood Trustee 12 December 2020
None on record
Keith Richard Burge Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Lorna Bennie Trustee 15 May 2020
None on record
JOANNE CURRY Trustee 26 June 2015
None on record