MANOR FARM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £933.92k £897.34k £970.57k £997.19k £1.01m
Total expenditure £915.02k £845.05k £879.81k £1.07m £967.44k
Income from government contracts £218.97k £27.17k £81.67k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.51k £135.33k £46.48k £64.90k £58.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.48k £21.53k £20.00k £5.90k £25.37k
Income - Other trading activities £527.43k £600.11k £496.58k £459.56k £431.24k
Income - Charitable activities £385.61k £257.79k £436.32k £513.60k £534.36k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.40k £17.91k £17.67k £18.14k £21.56k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £12.48k £21.53k £20.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £915.02k £845.05k £879.81k £1.07m £967.44k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £91.44k £25.24k £17.46k £13.90k £11.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0