THE NANTMOR MOUNTAIN CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1164407
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 December 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 December 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2016 01 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2016 Not Required