Financial history WIRRAL YOUTH ZONE

Charity number: 1163183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.34m £1.54m £1.79m £1.46m £1.88m
Total expenditure £253.76k £1.56m £1.97m £1.97m £1.55m
Income from government contracts £0 £404.73k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50m N/A £400.00k £400.00k £954.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.93m £632.29k £1.50m £1.21m £1.76m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £126.57k £0 £0 £20.47k
Income - Charitable activities £414.10k £742.21k £258.54k £246.21k £91.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £85 £0 £0 £47
Income - Other £0 £35.39k £27.29k £0 £8.69k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £234.41k £1.51m £1.91m £1.90m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.35k £43.01k £54.53k £74.28k £64.44k
Expenditure - Governance £3.60k £7.10k £37.95k £23.54k £25.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0