Accounts and annual returns YALA NKUWU ASSOCIATION.UK

Charity number: 1166227
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 April 2023 438 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 February 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 February 2021 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 February 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 February 2020 20 days late Download Open in new window