SYDENHAM HIGH SCHOOL PARENT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parents association for Sydenham High School GDST.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People
8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lewisham
Governance
- 03 May 2016: Standard registration
- SYDENHAM HIGH SCHOOL PSA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Larsson | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Panton | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Geldeard | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Bishton | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalie Frances Wilson | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mathias | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Meier | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Munday | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.26k | £16.57k | £13.85k | £1.78k | £16.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.52k | £33.66k | £5.46k | £5.18k | £11.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 February 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 September 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 02 October 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2016 as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE PSA ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SYDENHAM HIGH SCHOOL (THE SCHOOL) IN PARTICULAR BY: A) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND B) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sydenham High School
19 Westwood Hill
London
SE26 6BL
- Phone:
- 02085577000
- Email:
- info@sydpsa.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window