ST CUTHBERT'S SOCIETY JUNIOR COMMON ROOM

Charity number: 1168134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 06 September 2019 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 06 September 2019 98 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2019 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2019 273 days late Download