Accounts and annual returns WOOLDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507316
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 08 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 12 November 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 12 November 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 20 November 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required