BIDBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL - CIO

Charity number: 1166337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDY LIDDALL Trustee 11 March 2016 None on record
Michael Lee Trustee 04 April 2016 None on record
Anne Priscilla Musker Trustee 05 July 2021 None on record
Mike Harris Trustee 16 September 2016 None on record
QUENTIN STEVENS Trustee 09 March 2016 None on record
Graham Miller Trustee 11 July 2020 None on record
Mark Weavis Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record
GRAHAM PARSONS Chair 12 March 2016 None on record
AMANDA HARRIS Trustee 09 March 2016 None on record
Wendy Weavis Trustee 20 September 2016 None on record
DAVID WHEELER Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record
SARAH SMITH Trustee 09 March 2016 None on record
PETER RILEY Trustee 04 July 2016 None on record
DONALD BUCKLAND Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record