1ST FATFIELD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 507923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK MADDEN Trustee 26 September 2013 None on record
William Lyle Trustee 11 July 2019 None on record
Philip Allman Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Rachel Star Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Simon Thompson Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Neil Stoker Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
Ian Sime Chair 10 May 2016 None on record
Adam Moss Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
SHAUN WAYMAN Trustee 01 March 2015 None on record
Natasha McLoughlin Mrs Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record
Peter Noble Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record
KAREN TURNBULL Trustee None on record