ALNWICK GARDEN TOWN TRUST

Charity number: 1167341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 29 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 23 August 2020 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 23 August 2020 204 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 09 December 2019 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 09 December 2019 311 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download