Accounts and annual returns CHIPPENHAM STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1166717
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 April 2021 On time
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 April 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 May 2017 On time