Trustees PUBLISH WHAT YOU PAY
Charity number: 1170959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARLO MERLA | Chair | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SASWATI SWETLENA | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA Ibezim-Ohaeri | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Athayde Jose DA MOTTA FILHO | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANNE HAZLEDINE | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DETHERIDGE | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.