Trustees THE CLARE PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 1172604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suzanne Yvette Culshaw Chair 01 September 2017
None on record
Ian Alexander Carson Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Margaret Godwin Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Neil Craig Sanson Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Andrew Colin Brader Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
Robyn Jean Sheppard Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
Charles Marulaz Godfrey Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record