ALLOS MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity number: 1171240
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2019 On time Download