Accounts and annual returns ART FOR LIVING

Charity number: 1171972
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 100 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 100 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 465 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 465 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 12 December 2019 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required