ALL IN YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1170119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 September 2020 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 September 2020 64 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 September 2018 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 September 2018 69 days late Download