Accounts and annual returns THE TRANSFORMING AUTISM PROJECT

Charity number: 1173134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window