Financial history THE SUTTON HOO SHIP'S COMPANY

Charity number: 1175475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £32.40k £32.45k £112.26k £112.26k £203.40k
Total expenditure £23.62k £23.62k £67.60k £67.60k £32.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £750