SOUTH ATLANTIC ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1173105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES JUDGE MBE Chair 18 May 2017 None on record
PAUL BRICKLE Trustee 18 May 2017 None on record
Professor Stuart B Piertney Trustee 03 September 2018 None on record
Dr Teal Riley Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record
Stuart Wallace Trustee 04 April 2019 None on record
Professor Richard John Sanders Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record