Accounts and annual returns COUNTY IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1172602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 06 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window