LIVERPOOL ROOTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 509514
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 March 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 22 March 2021 45 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 April 2020 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 24 April 2020 79 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 March 2019 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 28 March 2019 51 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 08 February 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 08 February 2018 3 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 16 January 2017 On time Download