BRADING COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1172210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download