Trustees BRADING COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1172210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virginia Jane Byrne | Chair | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Drury | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Anne Magee | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Regan Benson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY GILBERT | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Bryn Davis | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Cathryn Elizabeth Mills | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Harryman | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Jane Lea Lane | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Francis Bacon | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.