CHAFFINCH

Charity number: 1173464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Chaffinch raises money and material support for children and young people in the Kibera slum in Nairobi, Kenya. These are used for food, shelter, education, medical care and other related expenses by locally run projects and enterprises who care for youngsters who are orphaned, abandoned or from very poor families. In one of the poorest places on the planet they are loved and cared for.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023

Total income: £42,515
Total expenditure: £42,976

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Kenya

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Chaytor Trustee 29 April 2023
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MIDDLESBROUGH SOUTH TEES AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
CHAFFINCH
Recently registered
Sharanjit kaur Dhami Trustee 29 April 2023
CHAFFINCH
Recently registered
Benjamin Thomas Rees Edwards Trustee 29 April 2023
None on record
Neil Hutton Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Kate Williamson Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Tobi Olofinnika Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £8.86k £16.94k £19.57k £28.02k £42.52k
Total expenditure £7.77k £11.14k £16.80k £29.14k £42.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 09 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 09 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 SPURR COURT
YORK
YO24 3ND
Phone:
01904791917