OATLANDS COMMUNITY GROUP CIO

Charity number: 1184148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 22 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 June 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download