Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST KENELM'S CHURCH UPTON SNODSBURY

Charity number: 1172859
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 20 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 20 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 25 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window