Trustees WHITEFIELD GOLF CLUB
Charity number: 1175450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Kolb | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hattersley | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Harris | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Kibble | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Barr | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gary Silver | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Davy | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Samuels | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
LIONEL RALPH LEVINE | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.